Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/31/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/31/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/01/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/01/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/01/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/02/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/02/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/02/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/03/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/03/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/04/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/07/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/07/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/09/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/09/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/09/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/14/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/14/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/21/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/24/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/24/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/24/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/28/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/28/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/29/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/30/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/15/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/15/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/21/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/21/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/12/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/12/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/18/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/18/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/22/2008