Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/17/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/18/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/02/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/24/2008