Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/31/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/31/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/31/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/31/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/31/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/01/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/04/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/09/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/16/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/17/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/30/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/30/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/30/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/12/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/14/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/29/2008