Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/13/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/23/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/29/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/30/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/09/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/17/2008