Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/02/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/02/2008
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 04/02/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/02/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/02/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/02/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/16/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/12/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/19/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/20/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/25/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/27/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/07/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2008