Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/17/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/20/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/07/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/31/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/16/2008