Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/07/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/07/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/07/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/07/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/09/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/09/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/09/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/09/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/14/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/15/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/16/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/16/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/17/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/17/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/21/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/22/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/23/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/23/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/23/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/23/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/23/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/24/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/28/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/29/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/29/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/29/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/07/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/20/2008