Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/03/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/04/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/04/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/04/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/04/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/04/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/07/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/07/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/07/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/07/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/07/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/08/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/08/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/09/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/09/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/10/2008