Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/08/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/06/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/14/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/14/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/14/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/14/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/21/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/18/2008