Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
06/03/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-242.
06/03/2008 Signed by President.
05/23/2008 Presented to President.
05/21/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 5/19/2008 H4111)
04/28/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3450)
04/28/2008 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3449-3450)
04/08/2008 Introduced in Senate