Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/15/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/21/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/23/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/06/2008