Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/15/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/15/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/15/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/16/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/02/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/02/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/05/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/09/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/08/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/31/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/23/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/23/2008