Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/16/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/16/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/16/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/16/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/18/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/23/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/23/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/23/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/28/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/29/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/01/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/02/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/06/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/06/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/07/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/08/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/14/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/15/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/20/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/10/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/17/2008