Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/21/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/21/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/21/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/21/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 04/21/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/22/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/23/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/24/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/24/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/28/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/02/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/02/2008