Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/22/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/22/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/23/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/23/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/23/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/28/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/28/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/13/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/08/2008