Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/12/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/17/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/22/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/22/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/22/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/29/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/29/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/05/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/02/2007