Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/24/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/24/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 04/24/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 04/24/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 04/24/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/24/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/28/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/22/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/22/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/31/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/12/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 09/17/2008