Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/29/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/29/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/01/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/07/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/08/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/15/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/15/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/04/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/11/2008