Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/16/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/22/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 01/26/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/26/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/06/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/15/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/28/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/28/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/28/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/05/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/14/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/10/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/10/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/10/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/17/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/18/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/24/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/24/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 05/17/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/05/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/12/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/24/2007