Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 04/30/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/01/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/01/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/01/2008
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/02/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/06/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/08/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/08/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/08/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/15/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/15/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/15/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/19/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/04/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/04/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/12/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/17/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/29/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/26/2008