Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/06/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/07/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/08/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/08/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/20/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/22/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/11/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/11/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/17/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/25/2008