Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/11/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/22/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/16/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/17/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/18/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/03/2007