Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/12/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/20/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/22/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/10/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/10/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/12/2008