There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Non-Foreign AREA Act of 2008
Non-Foreign Area Retirement Equity Assurance Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

Non-Foreign AREA Act of 2008
Non-Foreign Area Retirement Equity Assurance Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for retirement equity for Federal employees in nonforeign areas outside the 48 contiguous States and the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/01/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10392-10394)
09/11/2008Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with amendments. With written report No. 110-456.
05/13/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/02/2008HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
10/02/2008HouseReferred to House Oversight and Government Reform
10/02/2008HouseReferred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/02/2008-12:11pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/02/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/01/2008SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S10392-10394)
10/01/2008SenateS.Amdt.5689 Amendment SA 5689 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/01/2008SenateS.Amdt.5689 Amendment SA 5689 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Collins. (consideration: CR S10392; text: CR S10392) To strike the provision relating to election of coverage by employees, and for other purposes.
10/01/2008SenateThe committee amendments were agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
10/01/2008SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10390-10394; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S10390-10392)
09/11/2008SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 954.
09/11/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with amendments. With written report No. 110-456.
06/25/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
06/19/2008SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/13/2008SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4109-4111)
05/13/2008SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4109)

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/13/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/13/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/13/2008

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/13/2008 Referred to
06/25/2008 Markup by
09/11/2008 Reported by S. Rept. 110-456
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia06/19/2008 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform10/02/2008 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs10/02/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3013. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/01/2008)

Non-Foreign Area Retirement Equity Assurance Act of 2008 or the Non-Foreign AREA Act of 2008 - Revises federal employee locality-based comparability payments provisions to include U.S. territories and possessions, including the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, within a pay locality. Sets forth maximum rates of pay for Senior Executive Service (SES) personnel in such areas.

Revises the calculation of allowances based on living costs and conditions of environment for pay of employees stationed outside the continental United States or in Alaska to apply it only to areas designated as of December 31, 2008. Provides a formula for adjustment of such rate using a transition schedule for calendar years 2009-2011.

Requires adjustment of special rates of pay in such areas in accordance with regulations prescribed by the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) or by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) for VA personnel. Allows a temporarily raised limitation on the amount of special rates during the transition period.

Expresses the sense of Congress that application of this Act to an employee should not result in a decrease in take home pay.

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the Bureau of Labor Statistics will conduct separate surveys pursuant to the establishment by the President's Pay Agent of one new locality area for each of the entire state of Hawaii and the entire state of Alaska; and (2) upon the completion of the phase-in period no employee shall receive less than the rest of the U.S. locality pay rate.

Describes application of this Act to postal employees.

Defines as covered employees for purposes of this Act those who are or will be eligible for a cost-of-living allowance (COLA).

Allows an employee subject to this Act's transition schedule and who retires from service during the period from January 1, 2009, through December 31, 2011, to elect to have the COLA paid during that period considered as basic pay for purposes of annuity computation.