Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/06/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/11/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/17/2008
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 06/18/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/19/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/20/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/25/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/14/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/16/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/21/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/29/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/29/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/30/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 09/16/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/26/2008