Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/16/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/27/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/29/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/29/2008