There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Boy Scouts of America Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the centennial of the Boy Scouts of America, and for other proposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/22/2008Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/22/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/02/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/02/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/02/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/03/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/10/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/10/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/10/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/10/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/10/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/10/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/10/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/10/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/10/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/10/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/10/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/10/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/10/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/10/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/10/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/12/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/17/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/23/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/23/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/24/2008
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/10/2008 09/25/2008 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/22/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3070. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/22/2008)

Boy Scouts of America Centennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 350,000 $1 coins in commemoration of the centennial of the founding of the Boy Scouts of America.

Requires the coin design to be emblematic of the 100 years of the organization.

Restricts issuance of such coins to February 8 through December 31, 2010.

Subjects coin sales to a surcharge of $10 per coin.

Requires payment of such surcharges to the National Boy Scouts of America Foundation, to be made available to local councils in the form of grants for the extension of Scouting in hard-to-serve areas.