Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/22/2008
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 05/22/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/02/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/02/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/02/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/03/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/10/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/10/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/10/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 06/10/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/10/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/10/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/10/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/10/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/10/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/10/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/10/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/10/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/10/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/10/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/10/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/11/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/11/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/12/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/17/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 07/23/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/23/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/24/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew