Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 06/04/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/04/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/04/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/04/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/10/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/07/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/22/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/24/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/30/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/31/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/31/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/10/2008