Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 06/06/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/06/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/06/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/06/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/09/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/09/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/09/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/09/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/09/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 06/09/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/11/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/11/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/12/2008