Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 06/10/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/10/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/11/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/11/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/16/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/09/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/28/2008