Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/24/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/24/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 01/24/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/05/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/05/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/05/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/05/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/28/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/28/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/13/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/13/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/16/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/25/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/02/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/02/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/11/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/15/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/01/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/02/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/16/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/18/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/18/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 10/18/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/02/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 11/06/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 12/18/2007