Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/17/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/19/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/24/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/09/2008