Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/24/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/24/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/25/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/27/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/09/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/14/2008