There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

FIND Act
Fugitive Information Networked Database Act of 2008

Short Titles as Introduced

FIND Act
Fugitive Information Networked Database Act of 2008

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to encourage the entry of felony warrants into the NCIC database by States and provide additional resources for extradition.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/18/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
06/16/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
09/18/2008Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1032.
Action By: Senate
09/18/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
09/11/2008Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/16/2008Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5659)
Action By: Senate
06/16/2008Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5658-5659)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/15/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/26/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary06/16/2008 Referred to
09/11/2008 Markup by
09/18/2008 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.3136.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.3136. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (09/18/2008)

Fugitive Information Networked Database Act of 2008 or the FIND Act - Directs the Attorney General to make grants to states for use by states or Indian tribes to develop and implement or upgrade secure electronic warrant management systems for the preparation, submission, and validation of state felony warrants that are compatible and interoperable with the National Crime Information Center Database (NCIC Database). Provides for set asides of grant funds to hire additional personnel to validate warrants entered into the NCIC Database and for Indian tribal governments. Requires grant applicants to submit to the Attorney General: (1) a plan to develop and implement, or to upgrade, electronic warrant management systems; (2) a report on active felony warrants; and (3) guidelines for entering warrants into the NCIC Database. Authorizes appropriations for FY2009-FY2011.

Directs the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to provide technology and technical assistance to ensure the compatibility and interoperability of all state and local warrant databases with the NCIC Database.

Directs the Comptroller General to submit a statistical report to the House and Senate Judiciary Committees on felony warrants issued by state, local, and tribal governments and entered into the NCIC Database and on the apprehension and extradition of persons with active felony warrants.

Amends the Presidential Threat Protection Act of 2000 to extend through FY2015 the authorization of appropriations for the Fugitive Apprehension Task Forces. Requires allocations of funding to hire criminal investigators, for the establishment of new Regional Fugitive Task Forces, and for training.

Directs the Attorney General to assist states and local governments that participate in a Regional Fugitive Task Force by providing transportation of fugitives through the U.S. Marshals Service Justice Prisoner and Alien Transportation Service. Authorizes appropriations for FY2009-FY2014 to assist the extradition of fugitives through the U.S. Marshals Service Justice Prisoner and Alien Transportation Service.

Directs the Attorney General to: (1) make grants to states and Indian tribes for the extradition of fugitives from another state or Indian country for prosecution; and (2) audit biennially the use of funds for such purpose by states and Indian tribes. Authorizes appropriations for FY2009-FY2015.

Requires the Attorney General to report annually (by January 31) to the House and Senate Judiciary Committees on felony warrant information provided by states and Indian tribes and to provide information regarding best practices to each state and Indian tribe submitting information to the NCIC Database.