Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/16/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/16/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/19/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/23/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/10/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/15/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/21/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/28/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/08/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/16/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/01/2008