Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/18/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/18/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/07/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/15/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/16/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/17/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/23/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/31/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 10/02/2008