Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/27/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/11/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/12/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/18/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/08/2008