Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/19/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/08/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/17/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/22/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/30/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/31/2008