Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 06/19/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/19/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/19/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/20/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/24/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/24/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/24/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/25/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/25/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/26/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/26/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/27/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/08/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 07/08/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/08/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/08/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/08/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/22/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/31/2008