Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/26/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/07/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/14/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/15/2008