There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Warm in Winter and Cool in Summer Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide funding for the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/24/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date
07/26/2008Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S7509)
Action By: Senate
07/26/2008Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote Number 187) entered in Senate. (consideration: CR S7508)
Action By: Senate
07/26/2008Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 35. Record Vote Number: 187. (consideration: CR S7506-7509; text: CR S7508)
Action By: Senate
07/24/2008Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S7207, S7246-7253, S7256-7262)
Action By: Senate
07/23/2008Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S7131; text: CR S7131)
Action By: Senate
07/23/2008Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S7131-7140)
Action By: Senate
06/26/2008Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6212-6213)
Action By: Senate
06/25/2008Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 835.
Action By: Senate
06/24/2008Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/24/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/26/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 06/26/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/26/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/26/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/26/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/26/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/10/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/10/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/10/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/10/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/10/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/10/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/10/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/10/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/10/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/10/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/14/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/14/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/14/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/14/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/14/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/14/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/14/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/15/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/15/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/15/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/15/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/15/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/15/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/16/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/16/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/17/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/17/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/17/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/17/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/17/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/24/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/24/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/24/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/24/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/24/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/24/2008

Committees (0)

As of 06/24/2019 text has not been received for S.3186 - Warm in Winter and Cool in Summer Act

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3186. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/24/2008)

Warm in Winter and Cool in Summer Act - Makes appropriations for FY2008 for payments under the Low-Income Home Energy Assistance Act of 1981 (LIHEAP Program).