Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/28/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/29/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/29/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/30/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/18/2008