Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/27/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/07/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/07/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/09/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/11/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/11/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/11/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/14/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/17/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/21/2008