Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 07/10/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 07/10/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/22/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/08/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/09/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/02/2008