Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/15/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/15/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/15/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/16/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/16/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/16/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/17/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/17/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/17/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/17/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/21/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/21/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/21/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/22/2008