Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/22/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/31/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/31/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/08/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/08/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 09/22/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/25/2008