There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 101 West Main Street in Waterville, New York, as the "Corporal John P. Sigsbee Post Office".


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/2008Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
07/23/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/24/2008Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1063.
Action By: Senate
09/24/2008Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
09/23/2008Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/10/2008Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/23/2008Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/23/2008 Referred to
09/23/2008 Markup by
09/24/2008 Reported by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security09/10/2008 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.3317. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/23/2008)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 101 West Main Street in Waterville, New York, as the "Corporal John P. Sigsbee Post Office."