Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/13/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-403.
10/13/2008 Signed by President.
10/02/2008 Presented to President.
09/28/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 381 - 41 (Roll no. 664).(text: CR 9/27/2008 H10229-10236)
09/26/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/15/2008 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with amendments. Without written report.
07/24/2008 Introduced in Senate