Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/24/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 07/24/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 07/24/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/24/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/24/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/01/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/10/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/11/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 09/18/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/23/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/23/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/23/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/24/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/24/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/24/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/24/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/25/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/25/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/25/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/26/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/26/2008